|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1550.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1434.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|