|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 578, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 3062.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2304.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 1474.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|