|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 1799.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|