LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB922
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB922
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB922
Compare Versions
AB922 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB922 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB922 Amended September 2, 2011
AB922 Amended August 31, 2011
AB922 Amended June 20, 2011
AB922 Amended May 27, 2011
AB922 Amended March 29, 2011
AB922 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB922 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB922 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB922 Amended September 2, 2011
AB922 Amended August 31, 2011
AB922 Amended June 20, 2011
AB922 Amended May 27, 2011
AB922 Amended March 29, 2011
AB922 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare