|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 1657.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R. & S.S. and ED.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|