LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB926
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB926
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB926
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/28/2011
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
04/27/2011
Read second time and amended.
04/26/2011
From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26).
03/10/2011
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
02/20/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
02/18/2011
Read first time. To print.