|
09/08/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2368.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1452.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1044.) (H. & C.D. committee)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|