06/03/2011 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 13. Noes 49. Page 1863.). | |||
05/19/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1433.) | |||
03/30/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/29/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
03/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). | |||
03/14/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |