LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB943
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB943
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB943
Compare Versions
AB943 Chaptered July 25, 2011
AB943 Enrolled July 8, 2011
AB943 Amended June 23, 2011
AB943 Amended June 13, 2011
AB943 Amended May 2, 2011
AB943 Amended March 22, 2011
AB943 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB943 Chaptered July 25, 2011
AB943 Enrolled July 8, 2011
AB943 Amended June 23, 2011
AB943 Amended June 13, 2011
AB943 Amended May 2, 2011
AB943 Amended March 22, 2011
AB943 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare