LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB945
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB945
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB945
Action History
05/26/2011
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/12/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
03/29/2011
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
03/25/2011
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
03/10/2011
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
02/20/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
02/18/2011
Read first time. To print.