02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/10/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (December 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/15/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
06/14/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
06/13/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |