|
09/25/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6498.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4576.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1586.)
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|