California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB955 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/10/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 955ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 29, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 25, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 13, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Huber FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Sections 5073.5, 5073.7, and 5074 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recreational trails. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 955, Huber. Recreational trails: California Recreational Trails Committee. (1) Existing law, until January 1, 2013, requires the Governor to establish the California Recreational Trails Committee and appoint 7 members selected from lists submitted by private organizations that have a demonstrated interest in the establishment of recreational trails. This bill would instead extend the authorization for the committee to January 1, 2028, and require that the members be appointed based on their demonstrated interest and involvement in the establishment and promotion of recreational trails. (2) Existing law, until January 1, 2013, limits the terms of the members of the committee to 4 years, without compensation, other than reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses, including traveling expenses, incurred in the performance of member duties. This bill would extend the applicability of these provisions to January 1, 2028. (3) Existing law, until January 1, 2013, requires that the committee, among other duties, review records of easements and other interests in lands which are available for recreational trail usage, including public lands, utility easements, other rights-of-way, gifts, or surplus public lands which may be adaptable for such use, and also advise the Director of Parks and Recreation in the development of standards for trail construction. Existing law also requires the committee to study the problems and opportunities presented by the use of private property for recreational trail use and advise the director on measures to mitigate undesirable aspects of such usage. This bill would instead require that the committee, until January 1, 2028, review statewide trail planning efforts, assist with resolution of trail issues and user-group conflicts, and advise in the development of trail planning and management guidelines that may be available to public and private land managers. The bill would also require the committee to advise the director in the development of state park trail guidelines. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5073.5 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 5073.5. (a) The Governor shall establish a California Recreational Trails Committee to advise the director in the development and coordination of the system. The committee shall consist of seven members appointed by the Governor. Two members shall be selected from the northern, two members from the southern, and two members from the central portions of the state, and one member shall be selected at large. Members shall be selected based on their demonstrated interest and involvement in the establishment and promotion of recreational trails. The chair of the committee shall be elected by the members from their membership. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2028, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2028, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. Section 5073.7 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 5073.7. (a) The terms of the members of the committee shall be four years, except that such members first appointed to the committee shall classify themselves by lot so that the term of three members shall expire January 15, 1976, the term of two members shall expire January 15, 1977, and the term of two members shall expire January 15, 1978. Members of the committee shall serve without compensation, but shall be reimbursed for actual and necessary expenses, including traveling expenses, incurred in the performance of their duties. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2028, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2028, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 3. Section 5074 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 5074. The committee shall have the following powers and duties: (a) Coordinate trail planning and development among cities, counties, and districts. In carrying out this responsibility, the committee shall review statewide trail planning efforts, assist with resolution of trail issues and user-group conflicts, and advise in the development of trail planning and management guidelines that may be available to public and private land managers. (b) Advise the director in the preparation and maintenance of the plan and the development of state park trail guidelines. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2028, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2028, deletes or extends that date.