California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB96 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 14, 2011

Amended

Bill June 8, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011