08/25/2011 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
07/11/2011 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/20/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1747.) | |||
05/31/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
04/04/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |