02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/15/2011 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
04/14/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
04/13/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |