California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB966 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2011

Amended

Bill June 13, 2011
Bill May 9, 2011
Bill April 28, 2011