|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6637.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4974.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 3626.)
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3600.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Fong.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Fong.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 1692.) Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|