|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1706.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|