08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/06/2012 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/03/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
06/02/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/02/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 1779.) | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |