06/15/2011 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 10.5 suspended by unanimous consent. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15.). | |||
06/14/2011 | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1408.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 1411.) Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/10/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 10.5 suspended by unanimous consent. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 1369.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1375.). | |||
06/09/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
03/16/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (March 16). Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/15/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/07/2011 | Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/22/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
02/22/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 416.) | |||
02/18/2011 | Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/11/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |||
01/10/2011 | Read first time. To print. |