|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3082.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2363.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1567.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|