|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 485, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2917.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2198.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1658.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|