LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB997
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB997
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB997
Compare Versions
AB997 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB997 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB997 Amended June 28, 2011
AB997 Amended May 9, 2011
AB997 Amended April 11, 2011
AB997 Amended March 31, 2011
AB997 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB997 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB997 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB997 Amended June 28, 2011
AB997 Amended May 9, 2011
AB997 Amended April 11, 2011
AB997 Amended March 31, 2011
AB997 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare