LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB999
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB999
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB999
Compare Versions
AB999 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB999 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB999 Amended August 23, 2012
AB999 Amended June 7, 2012
AB999 Amended June 9, 2011
AB999 Amended May 11, 2011
AB999 Amended March 31, 2011
AB999 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB999 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB999 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB999 Amended August 23, 2012
AB999 Amended June 7, 2012
AB999 Amended June 9, 2011
AB999 Amended May 11, 2011
AB999 Amended March 31, 2011
AB999 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare