|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 190.).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 91.)
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Measure version as amended on March 1 corrected. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (March 2).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (February 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|