|
06/28/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 3, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 222.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 222.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 167.).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 128.).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 112.)
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|