|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2011-12 First Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 314.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 232.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (September 6).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 176.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 171.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|