LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX117
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX117
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX117
Compare Versions
ABX117 Chaptered September 21, 2011
ABX117 Enrolled September 8, 2011
ABX117 Amended September 7, 2011
ABX117 Amended September 2, 2011
ABX117 Introduced May 19, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
ABX117 Chaptered September 21, 2011
ABX117 Enrolled September 8, 2011
ABX117 Amended September 7, 2011
ABX117 Amended September 2, 2011
ABX117 Introduced May 19, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare