|
06/29/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2011-12 First Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 207.).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 136.).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2011
|
Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 10.5 suspended by unanimous consent. (Page 132.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 177.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 171.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|