09/14/2011 | Died on third reading file. | |||
09/08/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
09/07/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (September 7). | |||
09/06/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
09/01/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
06/06/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/03/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 178.) | |||
06/02/2011 | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 171.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/20/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read first time. To print. |