09/12/2011 | Died at Desk. | |||
08/15/2011 | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Held at Desk. | |||
06/15/2011 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 210.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 210.). | |||
06/15/2011 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Page 146.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 148.). | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
06/06/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/03/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 179.) | |||
06/02/2011 | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 171.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/20/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read first time. To print. |