|
09/14/2011
|
Died on third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (September 8).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 180.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 171.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|