LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX128
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX128
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX128
Action History
06/14/2011
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
06/08/2011
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
06/06/2011
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
06/03/2011
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 182.)
06/02/2011
Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 171.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
05/20/2011
From printer.
05/19/2011
Read first time. To print.