|
09/12/2011
|
Died on unfinished business file, reconsideration pending.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2011
|
Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 27. Page 336.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (September 9). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 331.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 234.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (September 6).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 183.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 171.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|