LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX140
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX140
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX140
Action History
09/02/2011
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
09/01/2011
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
08/31/2011
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
08/30/2011
From printer.
08/29/2011
Read first time. To print.