08/29/2012 | Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 6583.) | |||
08/20/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/16/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). | |||
08/08/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/05/2012 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/19/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
08/16/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/10/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 9. | |||
12/09/2010 | Introduced. To print. |