05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Held under submission. | |||
05/24/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/23/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/18/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/11/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/10/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 9. | |||
12/09/2010 | Introduced. To print. |