08/31/2012 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 6749.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gatto. | |||
08/27/2012 | Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6387.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gatto. Motion to reconsider continued until next Legislative day. | |||
08/21/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 6050.) | |||
01/23/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/19/2012 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Gatto. | |||
09/07/2011 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
08/26/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/25/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
08/17/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/10/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 9. | |||
12/09/2010 | Introduced. To print. |