08/31/2012 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6729.) Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 43. Noes 27. Page 6807.) | |||
08/23/2012 | Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 6214.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Swanson. | |||
06/20/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/19/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 18). | |||
05/10/2012 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/01/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |