LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA21
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA21
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA21
Action History
08/20/2012
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
08/16/2012
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
08/08/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
07/03/2012
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
06/15/2012
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and APPR.
01/06/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
01/05/2012
Read first time. To print.