08/22/2012 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Perea. | |||
08/21/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/20/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
08/16/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). | |||
08/08/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/27/2012 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/11/2012 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Read first time. To print. |