08/29/2011 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Blumenfield. | |||
08/26/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/06/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/15/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Read first time. To print. |