California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR112 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/25/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 112CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 31 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 25, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 21, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 1, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Campos (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Carter, Chesbro, Cook, Davis, Dickinson, Eng, Feuer, Fong, Fuentes, Beth Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Gorell, Grove, Hagman, Halderman, Harkey, Hayashi, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Lara, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mansoor, Mendoza, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Morrell, Nestande, Nielsen, Olsen, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Silva, Skinner, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, Wieckowski, Williams, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 22, 2012 Relative to the 24th Annual State Scientist Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 112, Campos. 24th Annual State Scientist Day. This measure would declare May 23, 2012, as the 24th Annual State Scientist Day, as a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California. WHEREAS, The state employs nearly 3,000 professional scientists in over 30 state departments working in more than 230 scientific classifications; and WHEREAS, State scientists hold graduate degrees in virtually every scientific discipline, including nematology, virology, seismology, epidemiology, toxicology, and many others; and WHEREAS, State scientists are represented by the California Association of Professional Scientists (CAPS), which is dedicated to professionalism, independence, and responsible advocacy; and WHEREAS, The work of state scientists protects the public from life-threatening diseases, safeguards our wildlife and abundant natural resources, and protects our air and water from toxic waste and pollution; and WHEREAS, State scientists are required to make critical decisions every day based on rigorous scientific factfinding, and these decisions ultimately impact the lives and property of all Californians; and WHEREAS, State scientists perform important work in the areas of infectious disease prevention, oil spill prevention and cleanup, public health drinking water monitoring, the protection of agricultural crops, brownfields mitigation, chemical and radiological disaster response, and much more; and WHEREAS, State scientists host an annual State Scientist Day at the State Capitol to increase public awareness and recognition of the significant contributions made by scientists working in state government while entertaining and educating over 2,000 elementary school students with fun, hands-on science exhibits; and WHEREAS, State Scientist Day has sparked an interest in science for thousands of California schoolchildren, legislators, state employees, and the public, who attend the special event; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That May 23, 2012, shall be recognized as the 24th Annual State Scientist Day, and that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.