California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR113 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 03/22/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 113CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 7 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 22, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE MARCH 15, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 12, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 12, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dickinson (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Campos, Carter, Cedillo, Chesbro, Conway, Cook, Davis, Donnelly, Eng, Feuer, Fong, Fuentes, Furutani, Beth Gaines, Galgiani, Gatto, Gordon, Grove, Hagman, Halderman, Hall, Harkey, Hayashi, Hill, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Knight, Lara, Logue, Ma, Mansoor, Mendoza, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Morrell, Nestande, Nielsen, Olsen, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Portantino, Silva, Skinner, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, Wieckowski, Williams, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 22, 2012 Relative to Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 113, Dickinson. Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week. This measure would declare the week of March 12, 2012, through March 16, 2012, as Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week. WHEREAS, The week of March 12, 2012, through March 16, 2012, has been declared Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week in recognition of the importance of finding the cause and cure for multiple sclerosis and to express appreciation to the National Multiple Sclerosis Society and its California chapters; and WHEREAS, Multiple sclerosis is a neurological disease of the central nervous system that affects an estimated 400,000 Americans across the country, and nearly 200 new cases are diagnosed each week nationwide; and WHEREAS, The California chapters of the National Multiple Sclerosis Society report that more than 40,000 people in California are affected by this devastating disease. Throughout the years, the California chapters have been committed to heightening public knowledge and insight and are currently planning several major statewide fundraisers and educational programs to raise awareness about the effects of multiple sclerosis; and WHEREAS, Twice as many women as men have multiple sclerosis and most are diagnosed between 20 and 50 years of age, and while studies indicate genetic factors make certain individuals more susceptible than others, there is no evidence that multiple sclerosis is directly inherited; and WHEREAS, The National Multiple Sclerosis Society, founded in 1946, funds more research, offers more services for people with multiple sclerosis, and provides more professional education programs than any other multiple sclerosis organization in the world. Through its home office in New York and its 50-state network of chapters, the society services more than one million people annually; and WHEREAS, The society is the largest private supporter of multiple sclerosis research in the world, and for more than 55 years it has funded innovative research and advocated for government support of important scientific inquiries; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That March 12, 2012, through March 16, 2012, is Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week and that the residents of the State of California should be encouraged to join together in raising awareness and heightening public knowledge of this debilitating disease; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.