03/22/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2012. | |||
03/22/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:50 p.m. | |||
03/15/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
03/15/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2951.) | |||
03/13/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/12/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3965.) | |||
03/08/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 8). | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. To print. |