09/04/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/04/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/23/2012 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6209.). | |||
08/22/2012 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
08/21/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4636.) | |||
08/16/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/13/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/07/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/06/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5759.) | |||
06/07/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 7). | |||
06/06/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/04/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. To print. |