05/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
05/07/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/07/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3431.) | |||
05/02/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/19/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/19/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4453.) | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/29/2012 | From printer. | |||
02/28/2012 | Introduced. To print. |