09/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/06/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
08/29/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/29/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2078.) | |||
07/13/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/04/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/31/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 767.) | |||
03/17/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/01/2011 | From printer. | |||
01/31/2011 | Introduced. To print. |