06/12/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/12/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
06/07/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/07/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3794.) | |||
05/23/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/26/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4101.) | |||
03/19/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 19). | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/01/2012 | Introduced. To print. |